NH SB663 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a credit against business taxes for employer payments in the graduate retention incentive partnership program.
Title
Establishing a credit against business taxes for employer payments in the graduate retention incentive partnership program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. David Doherty [D] | Rep. Linda Tanner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/06/2020; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 01/29/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 2 |