NH SB667 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the maximum optional fee for transportation improvements charged by municipalities when collecting motor vehicle registration fees.
Title
Relative to the maximum optional fee for transportation improvements charged by municipalities when collecting motor vehicle registration fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2020, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 2 |