NH SB669 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to authorization to grow industrial hemp.
Title
Relative to authorization to grow industrial hemp.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 8 P. 227 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0722s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0722s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0722s, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2 |