NH SB67 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Enrolled 06/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definitions of resident and residency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definitions of resident and residency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - OTP (Y: 215 N: 138 NV: 25 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 215-138 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 31
2019-05-07HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-07HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 9
2019-04-16HouseExecutive Session: 04/25/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 04/16/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1185s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Dietsch Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. Giuda objects to the motion to move the question; 03/28/2019 Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Dietsch Moved the Question; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1185s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1185s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-21SenateHearing: 03/13/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback