NH SB672 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to behavioral health services for children and certain revisions to notifications of discharge for individuals found incompetent to stand trial and nonemergency involuntary admissions revocation of conditional discharge.
Title
Relative to behavioral health services for children and certain revisions to notifications of discharge for individuals found incompetent to stand trial and nonemergency involuntary admissions revocation of conditional discharge.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] |
Rep. Skip Berrien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |