NH SB676 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Title
Relative to the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] |
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Gary Merchant [D] | Rep. Richard Osborne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2020-0776s, and 2020-0987s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2020-0987s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0776s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0776s, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Hearing: 02/18/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 03:30 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |