NH SB68 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 68 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 68 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the centralized voter registration database.
Title
Relative to the centralized voter registration database.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - OTP (Y: 214 N: 141 NV: 23 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - OTP (Y: 214 N: 141 NV: 23 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 68 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22 |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 07/10/2019 |
2019-06-12 | House | Enrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-141 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 33 |
2019-05-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-05-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 9 |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 04/16/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 69 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Without Objection, Sen. Cavanaugh Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |