NH SB680 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Public Works and Highways
Pending: House Public Works and Highways Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to materials used in the construction or repair of state roads and establishing a committee to study issues relating to paving New Hampshire Route 111 in Hampstead and Atkinson.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to materials used in the construction or repair of state roads and establishing a committee to study issues relating to paving New Hampshire Route 111 in Hampstead and Atkinson.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Public Works and Highways
2020-02-13SenateSen. Morse Floor Amendment # 2020-0632s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
2020-02-13SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2020-0493s and 2020-0632s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
2020-02-13SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-0493s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
2020-02-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0493s, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6
2020-01-16SenateHearing: 01/28/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 3
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback