NH SB682 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Division Vote. 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Division Vote. 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the sale of Lucky 7 tickets.
Title
Relative to the sale of Lucky 7 tickets.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Division Vote. 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Special Order to 03/05/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/13/2020 Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/22/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 2 |