NH SB69 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB69
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to short-term rentals.
Title
Relative to short-term rentals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB69 (Carry Over) 2019-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar