NH SB7 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB7
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 7-FN-L Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/16/2020; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 7-FN-L Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/16/2020; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the secure modern accurate registration act (SMART ACT).
Title
Establishing the secure modern accurate registration act (SMART ACT).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-16 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Concur (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 203 N: 163 NV: 11 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Concur (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 203 N: 163 NV: 11 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 7-FN-L Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/16/2020; Senate Journal 10 |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 07/31/2020 |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-07-16 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 74 |
2020-07-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1632e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 74 |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1632e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Sen. Levesque Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0457h: Motion Adopted DV 202-146 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 7 |
2020-03-05 | House | Amendment # 2020-0457h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 7 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0457h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 31 |
2020-01-28 | House | Division I Work Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-01-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 01/29/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-01-22 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/28/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-01-10 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/21/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-01-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2712h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 97 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Finance 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 97 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2712h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-163 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 97 |
2019-11-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2712h (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 21 |
2019-10-04 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-09-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-08-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 72 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1157s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1157s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1157s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0849s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0849s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0849s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB7 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate