NH SB702 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to contracting requirements for certain providers of child welfare services with the department of health and human services.
Title
Relative to contracting requirements for certain providers of child welfare services with the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1073s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1073s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1073s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |