NH SB705 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to fraudulent impersonation using a social networking site.
Title
Relative to fraudulent impersonation using a social networking site.
Sponsors
Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] |
Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1045s, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1045s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1045s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |