NH SB71 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Retained in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the election of delegates to party conventions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the election of delegates to party conventions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseRetained in Committee
2019-04-30HouseExecutive Session: 05/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-09House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-07Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/13/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 12:30 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback