NH SB710 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Sen. Fuller Clark Move to Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Sen. Fuller Clark Move to Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a homeowners' association act.
Title
Establishing a homeowners' association act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Move to Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Reconsider the vote on: Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Without Objection, SB 710 is ordered to be considered at the present time, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 2 |