NH SB716 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Medicaid coverage for child health and development.
Title
Relative to Medicaid coverage for child health and development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 5 P. 56 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0316s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0316s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0316s, 02/06/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 03:20 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |