NH SB718 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the New Hampshire state health improvement plan and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to the New Hampshire state health improvement plan and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Polly Campion [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Rep. Charles McMahon [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Salloway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1072s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1072s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1072s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Hearing: 02/18/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 03:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |