NH SB724 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to removal of abandoned or disabled vehicles by towing.
Title
Relative to removal of abandoned or disabled vehicles by towing.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. David Starr [R] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Rep. Nicole Klein-Knight [D] |
Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Rep. Peter Bixby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 5 |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 8 P. 227 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0756s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0756s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0756s, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 02/18/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 2 |