NH SB733 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to penalties for schools that fail to file certain reports with the department of education.
Title
Relative to penalties for schools that fail to file certain reports with the department of education.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] | Rep. David Doherty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/19/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Moved to Remove SB 733 from the Consent Calendar; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/11/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 2 |