NH SB739 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to mental health and substance use disorder insurance coverage.
Title
Relative to mental health and substance use disorder insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Greg Indruk [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. John Fothergill [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Sen. Morse Moved to Remove SB 739 from the Consent Calendar; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/11/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 2 |