NH SB76 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Signed by the Governor on 09/11/2019; Chapter 343; Effective 11/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Signed by the Governor on 09/11/2019; Chapter 343; Effective 11/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the prohibition of offshore oil and natural gas exploration.
Title
Relative to the prohibition of offshore oil and natural gas exploration.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Tamara Le [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 09/11/2019; Chapter 343; Effective 11/10/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-08 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 05/08/2019 |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Science, Technology and Energy 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 7 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 7 |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 6 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 11 P. 69 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0880s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2019-0880s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved to Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |