NH SB8 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Retained in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing an independent redistricting commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an independent redistricting commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseRetained in Committee
2019-04-16HouseExecutive Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-02HousePublic Hearing: 04/09/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-28SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Feltes Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-1197s, and 2019-1309s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2019-1309s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1197s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1197s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-13SenateHearing: 02/20/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback