NH SB8 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB8
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an independent redistricting commission.
Title
Establishing an independent redistricting commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 224 N: 141 NV: 13 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0224h (Vote 13-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 9 |
2020-01-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 01/29/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-01-22 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/28/2020 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-01-10 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/21/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-01-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2802h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 100 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Finance 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 100 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2802h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 224-141 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 100 |
2019-11-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2802h (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 21 |
2019-10-04 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-08-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 04/09/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 72 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Without Objection, Sen. Feltes Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-1197s, and 2019-1309s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2019-1309s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1197s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1197s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB8 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate