NH SB82 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to identify strategies needed for developing and implementing a competency-based public education system.
Title
Establishing a commission to identify strategies needed for developing and implementing a competency-based public education system.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Judith Spang [D] | Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Rep. Frank Sapareto [R] | Rep. Anne Grassie [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Patricia Lovejoy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-18 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-09-03 | House | =RESCEDULED=Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-08-07 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/13/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-05-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-05-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/15/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-04-30 | House | Executive Session: 5/9/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 ==RECESSED== |
2013-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 4/23/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0328s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0328s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0328s, 3/7/13; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 2/5/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |