NH SB82 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 301; Effective 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 301; Effective 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school food and nutrition programs.
Title
Relative to school food and nutrition programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/29/2019; Chapter 301; Effective 07/01/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2518c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report 2518c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 3 |
2019-06-19 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2518c Filed 06/13/2019; As Amended by the House |
2019-06-14 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Cornell Replaces Rep. Myler 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 20 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/17/2019, 09:30 am, Room 100, State House |
2019-06-13 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Myler, Luneau, Ford, Weyler 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 45 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Myler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 45 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators D'Allesandro, Fuller Clark, Giuda; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2145h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 60 |
2019-06-05 | House | Amendment # 2019-2145h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 60 |
2019-05-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2145h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 22-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 14 |
2019-05-22 | House | Executive Session: 05/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-05-21 | House | Division II Work Session: 05/22/2019 11:05 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-05-15 | House | Division II & III Work Session: 05/21/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 11 |
2019-05-07 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2019-1833h: 05/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 Division III & II |
2019-05-06 | House | Division II Work Session: 05/07/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Finance 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 11 |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 8 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 11 P. 69 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4 |