NH SB91 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB91
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0206; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0206; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the title loan default process.
Title
Relative to the title loan default process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0206; Effective 08/07/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/26/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 3 |
2018-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/10/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/03/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/28/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-2506s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2017-2506s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2506s, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/29/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB91 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11