NH SB91 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the release of a defendant pending trial.
Title
Relative to the release of a defendant pending trial.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Dennis Fields [R] | Rep. Dave Testerman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 100, State House, 11:30 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |