NH SB92 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 190; Effective 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 190; Effective 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transfer of vehicle ownership.
Title
Relative to transfer of vehicle ownership.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 190; Effective 01/01/2020 |
2019-06-12 | House | Enrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 19 |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 7 |
2019-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-04-11 | House | Public Hearing: 04/16/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 11 P. 69 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |