NH SB95 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB95
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a working families property tax refund program.
Title
Establishing a working families property tax refund program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/13/2019, Room 100, State House, 12:15 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB95 (Carry Over) 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate