NH SB96 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a film production incentive fund in the state film office.
Title
Establishing a film production incentive fund in the state film office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 23 |
2019-05-29 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 06/05/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 9 |
2019-05-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-05-15 | House | Executive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-05-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/14/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 3 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1571h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 3 |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-1571h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 3 |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1571h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4 |
2019-04-23 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-04-03 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 69 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0851s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0851s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0851s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |