NH SB97 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2019; Chapter 0155; Effective 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to special health care services licenses and establishing a committee to study providing certain health care services while ensuring increased access to affordable health care in rural areas of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to special health care services licenses and establishing a committee to study providing certain health care services while ensuring increased access to affordable health care in rural areas of the state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/01/2019; Chapter 0155; Effective 07/01/2019
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 14
2019-05-09HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 5
2019-04-30HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-17HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1372s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-1372s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1190s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1190s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-20SenateHearing: 03/13/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:10 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback