NH SB98 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - III. Remainder Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifying the New Hampshire trust code and establishing a committee to study the effects of past trust code legislation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying the New Hampshire trust code and establishing a committee to study the effects of past trust code legislation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 209 N: 142 NV: 14 Abs: 33) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateIII. Remainder Effective 07/12/2019
2019-07-16SenateII. Sections 1, 3, 4 Effective 09/10/2019
2019-07-16SenateI. Section 2 Effective 07/12/2019
2019-07-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 230
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2059h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 23
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-1538h: Amendment Failed Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 23
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-2059h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 23
2019-05-29HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1538h
2019-05-29HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2059h (NT) for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 10
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session: 05/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-05-08HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/16/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 04/16/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14
2019-02-20SenateHearing: 03/05/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback