NJ A10 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises requirements to authorize and access medical cannabis; establishes Cannabis Regulatory Commission; revises permit requirements for alternative treatment centers; and establishes additional legal protections for patients and caregivers. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises requirements to authorize and access medical cannabis; establishes Cannabis Regulatory Commission; revises permit requirements for alternative treatment centers; and establishes additional legal protections for patients and caregivers. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S10 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-05-30SenatePassed by the Senate (33-4)
2019-05-30SenateEmergency Resolution (33-4) (Vitale)
2019-05-30SenateMotion To Table Sa (23-13) (Weinberg)
2019-05-30SenateMotion To Sa (Singer)
2019-05-30SenateSenate Amendment (32-0) (Vitale)
2019-05-30SenateSubstituted for S10 (SCS/5R)
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (65-5-6)
2019-05-23AssemblyMotion To Table (Greenwald) (45-27-0)
2019-05-23AssemblyMotion To Aa (Dimaio)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-20AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-03-18AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-31AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-12-17AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-11-26AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S10 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A10 (ACS/1R)
S20 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A20

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback