NJ A1003 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1085
Note: Carry Over of previous A4101
Note: Carry Over of previous S2889
Note: Carry Over of previous A4101
Note: Carry Over of previous S2889
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to develop outreach plan to inform certain students about Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Title
Requires DHS to develop outreach plan to inform certain students about Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-3-3) |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1003 (Carry Over) 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4101 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1135 (Same As) 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2889 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4101 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1135 (Same As) 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2889 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee