NJ A1029 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A664
Note: Carry Over of previous A4506
Note: Carry Over of previous A4506
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (53-17-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (53-17-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies the Judiciary's Foreclosure Mediation Program; dedicates monies from foreclosure filing fees and fines.
Title
Codifies the Judiciary's Foreclosure Mediation Program; dedicates monies from foreclosure filing fees and fines.
Sponsors
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Gerald Green [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] |
Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (53-17-0) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1029 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (53-17-0)
A4506 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1130 (Same As) 2017-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4506 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1130 (Same As) 2017-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading