NJ A1049 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2115

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the "New Jersey Residential Foreclosure Transformation Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "New Jersey Residential Foreclosure Transformation Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1513 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-27AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-08-27SenatePassed by the Senate (25-14)
2020-08-27SenateSubstituted for S1513 (2R)
2020-07-30SenateSenate Amendment (26-0) (Cruz-Perez)
2020-07-16SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
2020-06-18AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-5-0)
2020-06-15AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2115 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1513 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A1049 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback