NJ A1070 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5975
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved P.L.2021, c.76.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved P.L.2021, c.76.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Secretary of Higher Education to develop guidance for institutions of higher education to identify cultural barriers in recruitment and retention of underrepresented students for science, technology, engineering and mathematics (STEM) programs.
Title
Requires Secretary of Higher Education to develop guidance for institutions of higher education to identify cultural barriers in recruitment and retention of underrepresented students for science, technology, engineering and mathematics (STEM) programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] |
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2892 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2892 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.76. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Substituted for S2892 |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5975 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S2892 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Substituted by A1070
S2892 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Substituted by A1070