NJ A1277 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A222
Note: Carry Over of previous A5279
Note: Carry Over of previous A5279
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.463.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.463.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospitals and homeless shelters to provide information on services and resources to individuals who are homeless or military veterans.
Title
Requires hospitals and homeless shelters to provide information on services and resources to individuals who are homeless or military veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2629 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.463. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2629 |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1277 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.463.
A5279 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2629 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A1277
A5279 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2629 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A1277