NJ A1284 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1298
Note: Carry Foward to future S2140
Note: Carry Over of previous A3084
Note: Carry Over of previous S878
Note: Carry Foward to future S2140
Note: Carry Over of previous A3084
Note: Carry Over of previous S878
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts authority to terminate reciprocal personal income tax agreements with other states.
Title
Restricts authority to terminate reciprocal personal income tax agreements with other states.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1284 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A1284 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A3084 (Carry Over) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S878
S563 (Same As) 2020-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S878 (Carry Over) 2018-08-27 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A1284 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A3084 (Carry Over) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S878
S563 (Same As) 2020-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S878 (Carry Over) 2018-08-27 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1284 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1284_I1.HTM |