NJ A1335 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2739
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S1569 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S1569 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires boards of education to include instruction, and adopt instructional materials, that accurately portray political, economic, and social contributions of persons with disabilities and lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender people.
Title
Requires boards of education to include instruction, and adopt instructional materials, that accurately portray political, economic, and social contributions of persons with disabilities and lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender people.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted by S1569 (2R) |
2018-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2739 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1569 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.6.
S1569 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.6.