NJ A1371 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4552
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Substituted by S606 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Substituted by S606 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages local units to plan for electric vehicle charging infrastructure.
Title
Encourages local units to plan for electric vehicle charging infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S606 (1R) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4552 (Carry Over) 2017-06-19 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S606 (Same As) 2019-11-06 - Approved P.L.2019, c.267.
S606 (Same As) 2019-11-06 - Approved P.L.2019, c.267.