NJ A1487 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3979
Note: Carry Foward to future S1256
Note: Carry Over of previous A1772
Note: Carry Foward to future S1256
Note: Carry Over of previous A1772
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2371 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2371 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits inclusion of volunteer firefighters and other emergency responders within municipal eligible employee group for purposes of the small employer health benefits plan statutes.
Title
Permits inclusion of volunteer firefighters and other emergency responders within municipal eligible employee group for purposes of the small employer health benefits plan statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S2371 (1R) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1487 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2371 (1R)
A1487 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2371 (1R)
A1772 (Carry Over) 2016-09-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2371 (Same As) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A1487 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2371 (1R)
A1772 (Carry Over) 2016-09-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2371 (Same As) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence