NJ A1526 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3303
Note: Carry Over of previous A4410
Note: Carry Over of previous A4410
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns payment of independent contractors.*
Title
Concerns payment of independent contractors.*
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1048 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1048 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-16-3) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-14) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S1048 (2R) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Vitale) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Vitale) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-19-4) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1526 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4410 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1048 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A1526 (3R)
A4410 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1048 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A1526 (3R)