NJ A1565 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4702
Note: Carry Foward to future S3130
Note: Carry Over of previous A1052
Note: Carry Over of previous S256
Note: Carry Foward to future S3130
Note: Carry Over of previous A1052
Note: Carry Over of previous S256
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates alternate voting members on county agriculture development boards.
Title
Creates alternate voting members on county agriculture development boards.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1565 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1565 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1052 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S256 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1565 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1052 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S256 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee