NJ A1570 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires fire suppression systems in new single and two family homes.
Title
Requires fire suppression systems in new single and two family homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2273 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2273 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-13) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S2273 |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (44-30-0) |
2012-12-17 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Fuentes) |
2012-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2273 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A1570 (2R)