NJ A1741 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3087
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S716 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S716 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Thomas P. Canzanella Twenty First Century First Responders Protection Act"; concerns workers' compensation for public safety workers.
Title
"Thomas P. Canzanella Twenty First Century First Responders Protection Act"; concerns workers' compensation for public safety workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S716 (1R) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3087 (Carry Over) 2016-02-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S716 (Same As) 2019-07-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.156.
S716 (Same As) 2019-07-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.156.