NJ A1906 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4681
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Approved P.L.2020, c.73.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Approved P.L.2020, c.73.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Includes false incrimination and filing false police report as form of bias intimidation; establishes crime of false 9-1-1 call with purpose to intimidate or harass based on race or other protected class.
Title
Includes false incrimination and filing false police report as form of bias intimidation; establishes crime of false 9-1-1 call with purpose to intimidate or harass based on race or other protected class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2635 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.73. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2635/2578 (SCS) |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4681 (Carry Over) 2018-10-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2635 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A1906/4230 (ACS)
S2578 (Same As) 2020-07-28 - Combined with S2635 (SCS)
S2635 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A1906/4230 (ACS)
S2578 (Same As) 2020-07-28 - Combined with S2635 (SCS)