NJ A1908 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2156
Note: Carry Foward to future S766
Note: Carry Over of previous A2100
Note: Carry Foward to future S766
Note: Carry Over of previous A2100
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Chloe's Pet Access Law" permits dogs in outdoor seating areas of restaurants under certain circumstances; codifies current requirements concerning live animals in food establishments.
Title
"Chloe's Pet Access Law" permits dogs in outdoor seating areas of restaurants under certain circumstances; codifies current requirements concerning live animals in food establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1908 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1908 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2100 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S4328 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1908 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2100 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S4328 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee