NJ A1914 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2161
Note: Carry Foward to future S3151
Note: Carry Over of previous A2753
Note: Carry Foward to future S3151
Note: Carry Over of previous A2753
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows NJ gross income tax deduction for charitable contributions of food made from business inventory.
Title
Allows NJ gross income tax deduction for charitable contributions of food made from business inventory.
Sponsors
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] |
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1914 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1914 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2753 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3012
S1600 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1914 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2753 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3012
S1600 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee