NJ A20 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S2273 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S2273 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires SEHBP and eligible employers that do not participate in the SEHBP to provide certain plans for public education employees and certain public education retirees.
Title
Requires SEHBP and eligible employers that do not participate in the SEHBP to provide certain plans for public education employees and certain public education retirees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2273 (1R) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2273 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.44.